CA AB429 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 22 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-09-06 - Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Beall.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 22 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-09-06 - Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Beall.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Sections 8875.45 and 8875.46 to the Government Code, relating to state government.
Title
Seismically vulnerable buildings: inventory.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-08-30 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-01 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - Assembly - AB 429 Nazarian Assembly Third Reading (Y: 77 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-01 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - Assembly - AB 429 Nazarian Assembly Third Reading (Y: 77 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-09-06 | Senate | Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Beall. |
2019-09-03 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-08-30 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2019-08-30 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 30). |
2019-07-01 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2019-06-11 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (June 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Referred to Com. on G.O. |
2019-05-23 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2019-05-22 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 1. Page 1804.) |
2019-05-20 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-05-16 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (May 16). |
2019-04-24 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2019-04-04 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 20. Noes 0.) (April 3). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-03-21 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on G.O. |
2019-03-20 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on G.O. Read second time and amended. |
2019-03-18 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on G.O. |
2019-02-08 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 10. |
2019-02-07 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 8875.45 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Government Code | 8875.46 | New Code | See Bill Text |