CA AB427 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-01 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-01 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 38530 of the Health and Safety Code, and to amend Section 380 of the Public Utilities Code, relating to electricity.
Title
Electricity: resource adequacy requirements.
Sponsors
Asm. Rebecca Bauer-Kahan [D] | Sen. Henry Stern [D] | Sen. Josh Becker [D] | Asm. Steve Bennett [D] |
Asm. David Chiu [D] | Asm. Chris Ward [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-21 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-01 | Assembly | From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. |
2022-01-31 | Assembly | Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. |
2021-05-20 | Assembly | In committee: Held under submission. |
2021-05-12 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2021-04-27 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-04-26 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2021-04-22 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 2.) (April 21). |
2021-02-12 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on U. & E. |
2021-02-05 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 7. |
2021-02-04 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 38530 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Utilities Code | 380 | Amended Code | Citation Text |