CA AB427 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Vetoed on September 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-23 - Vetoed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on September 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-23 - Vetoed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Part 6.8 (commencing with Section 15375) to Division 3 of Title 2 of the Government Code, relating to aerospace.
Title
California Aerospace and Aviation Commission.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-08-27 - Assembly - AB 427 MURATSUCHI Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-21 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB427 Muratsuchi et al. By Allen (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-16 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-06 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-07 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-29 - Assembly - AB 427 MURATSUCHI Assembly Third Reading (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-18 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-09 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-04 - Assembly - Be re-referred to the Committee on [Jobs, Economic Development, and the Economy] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Transportation] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-21 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB427 Muratsuchi et al. By Allen (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-16 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-06 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-07 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-29 - Assembly - AB 427 MURATSUCHI Assembly Third Reading (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-18 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-09 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-04 - Assembly - Be re-referred to the Committee on [Jobs, Economic Development, and the Economy] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Transportation] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-23 | Vetoed by Governor. | |
2018-09-04 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. |
2018-08-27 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 6651.). |
2018-08-22 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 24 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2018-08-21 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5553.). |
2018-08-20 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-08-17 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2018-08-17 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 16). |
2018-08-06 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2018-06-21 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-06-21 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. |
2018-06-20 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2018-06-20 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2018-06-18 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2018-05-08 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2018-05-07 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (May 7). |
2018-04-26 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on B., P. & E.D. and JUD. |
2018-01-29 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2018-01-29 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 3854.) |
2018-01-22 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-01-18 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (January 18). |
2018-01-18 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2018-01-12 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-01-11 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2018-01-10 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (January 9). |
2018-01-04 | Assembly | From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on J., E.D., & E. Re-referred. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (January 4). Re-referred to Com. on J., E.D., & E. |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96. |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended. |
2017-04-24 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2017-04-05 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (April 5). Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2017-02-21 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on A.,E.,S.,T., & I.M. and TRANS. |
2017-02-10 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 12. |
2017-02-09 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 15375 | New Code | See Bill Text |