CA AB424 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-14 - In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 2025.340 of the Code of Civil Procedure, relating to depositions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Depositions: audio or video recordings.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-14 - Assembly - AB 424 Gabriel Assembly Third Reading (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-14SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2019-03-14AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate.
2019-03-13AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-03-12AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (March 12).
2019-02-15AssemblyReferred to Com. on JUD.
2019-02-08AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 10.
2019-02-07AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Code of Civil Procedure2025.340Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback