CA AB424 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on October 14 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-14 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 779, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 626.9, 26370, and 26405 of the Penal Code, relating to firearms.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Possession of a firearm in a school zone.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-09-11 - Assembly - AB 424 MCCARTY Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 44 N: 27 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-06 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB424 McCarty et al. By Skinner (Y: 25 N: 13 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-27 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-22 - Assembly - AB 424 MCCARTY Assembly Third Reading (Y: 48 N: 28 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-14 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-10-14 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 779, Statutes of 2017.
2017-10-14 Approved by the Governor.
2017-09-18AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
2017-09-11AssemblySenate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 44. Noes 27. Page 3135.).
2017-09-06AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 8 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
2017-09-06SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 25. Noes 13. Page 2497.).
2017-08-31SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2017-08-30SenateRead third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2017-07-11SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2017-07-10SenateFrom committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
2017-06-27SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (June 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-06-19SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
2017-06-01SenateReferred to Com. on PUB. S.
2017-05-22SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2017-05-22AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 48. Noes 28. Page 1638.)
2017-05-11AssemblyRead third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 1471.)
2017-04-06AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2017-04-05AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 6.) (April 5).
2017-03-15AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (March 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-02-21AssemblyReferred to Com. on PUB. S.
2017-02-10AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 12.
2017-02-09AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Penal Code26370Amended CodeCitation Text
Penal Code26405Amended CodeCitation Text
Penal Code626.9Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback