CA AB424 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-13 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 71, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 101, 102, 103, and 109 of the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to juveniles.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Court appointed child advocates: wards.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-06-25 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd AB424 Beth Gaines (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-09 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-23 - Assembly - AB 424 GAINES Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-04-15 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-24 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations to Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-07-13 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 71, Statutes of 2015.
2015-07-13 Approved by the Governor.
2015-07-01AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 2:30 p.m.
2015-06-25AssemblyIn Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
2015-06-25SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 1619.).
2015-06-23SenateRead second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
2015-06-22SenateFrom committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
2015-06-10SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 9). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2015-05-07SenateReferred to Com. on JUD.
2015-04-23SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2015-04-23AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 1109.)
2015-04-16AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
2015-04-15AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (April 15).
2015-03-24AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (March 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2015-03-19AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on JUD.
2015-03-18AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended.
2015-03-02AssemblyReferred to Com. on JUD.
2015-02-20AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 22.
2015-02-19AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations


California State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/cgi-bin/postquery?bill_number=ab_424&sess=1516&house=A
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_0401-0450/ab_424_bill_20150219_introduced.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_0401-0450/ab_424_bill_20150318_amended_asm_v98.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_0401-0450/ab_424_bill_20150629_enrolled.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_0401-0450/ab_424_bill_20150713_chaptered.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_0401-0450/ab_424_vote_20150324_000001_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_0401-0450/ab_424_vote_20150415_000001_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_0401-0450/ab_424_vote_20150423_1001AM_asm_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_0401-0450/ab_424_vote_20150609_000001_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_0401-0450/ab_424_vote_20150625_1055AM_sen_floor.html

Bill Comments

feedback