CA AB424 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 2 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-10-02 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 484, Statutes of 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 33540 of the Education Code, relating to pupil instruction.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Pupil instruction: social sciences: State and Federal

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-09-06 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB424 Donnelly By Wyland (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-19 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-23 - Assembly - AB 424 DONNELLY Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-05-15 - Assembly - Do pass as amended, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-01 - Assembly - Do pass and re-refer to Committee on Appropriations with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-01 - Assembly - Reconsideration granted (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-03 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 2 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-10-02 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 484, Statutes of 2013.
2013-10-02 Approved by the Governor.
2013-09-23AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
2013-09-06AssemblyIn Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
2013-09-06SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 2177.).
2013-07-02SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2013-07-01SenateFrom committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
2013-06-19SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (June 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2013-06-06SenateReferred to Com. on ED.
2013-05-23SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2013-05-23AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 1580.)
2013-05-21AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
2013-05-20AssemblyRead second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2013-05-16AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass as amended. To consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 15).
2013-05-06AssemblyJoint Rule 62(a) suspended. (Ayes 66. Noes 1. Page 1244.) (J.R. 62(a) suspended to allow the Com. on ED. to grant reconsideration after 15 legislative days.) Received May 3 pursuant to Joint Rule 61(a)(2). From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (May 1). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2013-05-01AssemblyIn committee: Reconsideration granted.
2013-04-24AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on ED.
2013-04-23AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended.
2013-04-03AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Failed passage.
2013-03-14AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on ED.
2013-03-13AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended.
2013-02-28AssemblyReferred to Com. on ED.
2013-02-19AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 21.
2013-02-15AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Education Code33540Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code51220Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/cgi-bin/postquery?bill_number=ab_424&sess=1314&house=A
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0401-0450/ab_424_bill_20130215_introduced.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0401-0450/ab_424_bill_20130313_amended_asm_v98.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0401-0450/ab_424_bill_20130423_amended_asm_v97.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0401-0450/ab_424_bill_20130520_amended_asm_v96.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0401-0450/ab_424_bill_20130215_introduced.pdf
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0401-0450/ab_424_bill_20130313_amended_asm_v98.pdf
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0401-0450/ab_424_bill_20130423_amended_asm_v97.pdf
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0401-0450/ab_424_bill_20130520_amended_asm_v96.pdf
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0401-0450/ab_424_bill_20130912_enrolled.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0401-0450/ab_424_bill_20131002_chaptered.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0401-0450/ab_424_vote_20130403_000002_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0401-0450/ab_424_vote_20130501_000005_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0401-0450/ab_424_vote_20130501_000006_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0401-0450/ab_424_vote_20130515_000001_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0401-0450/ab_424_vote_20130523_1215PM_asm_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0401-0450/ab_424_vote_20130619_000001_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0401-0450/ab_424_vote_20130906_1249PM_sen_floor.html

Bill Comments

feedback