CA AB424 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on September 25 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-09-25 - Vetoed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Section 53114.5 to the Government Code, relating to the 911 emergency telephone number system.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Warren-911-Emergency Assistance Act: public education

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2010-08-31 - Assembly - AB 424 Torres Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 52 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2010-08-25 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB424 Torres (Y: 21 N: 10 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2010-08-12 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2010-07-15 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-15 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-27 - Assembly - AB 424 TORRES Assembly Third Reading (Y: 46 N: 24 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-21 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-12 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2010-09-25 Vetoed by Governor.
2010-09-15 Enrolled and to the Governor at 4:45 p.m.
2010-08-31 In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 52. Noes 25. Page 6932.)
2010-08-25 Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 21. Noes 10. Page 4873.)
2010-08-17 Read second time. To third reading.
2010-08-16 From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 4.) (August 12). Received August 13 pursuant to Joint Rule 61(b)(14)
2010-07-15 In committee: Placed on APPR suspense file.
2010-06-22 Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2010-06-21 From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 1.) (June 15).
2010-02-11 Referred to Com. on E., U., & C.
2010-01-28 In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2010-01-27 Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 46. Noes 24. Page 3908.)
2010-01-25 Read second time. To third reading.
2010-01-21 In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (January 21).
2010-01-14 Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2010-01-13 From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended.
2010-01-12 From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 7. Noes 4.) (January 12).
2010-01-11 Re-referred to Com. on B. & P.
2010-01-07 From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & P. Read second time and amended.
2010-01-04 From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & P. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B. & P.
2009-04-28 In committee: Set, first hearing. Held under submission.
2009-04-23 Re-referred to Com. on B. & P.
2009-04-22 From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & P. Read second time and amended.
2009-04-14 In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
2009-03-16 Referred to Com. on B. & P.
2009-02-24 From printer. May be heard in committee March 26.
2009-02-23 Read first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Government Code53114.5New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/cgi-bin/postquery?bill_number=ab_424&sess=0910&house=A
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/asm/ab_0401-0450/ab_424_bill_20090223_introduced.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/asm/ab_0401-0450/ab_424_bill_20090422_amended_asm_v98.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/asm/ab_0401-0450/ab_424_bill_20100104_amended_asm_v97.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/asm/ab_0401-0450/ab_424_bill_20100107_amended_asm_v96.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/asm/ab_0401-0450/ab_424_bill_20100113_amended_asm_v95.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/asm/ab_0401-0450/ab_424_bill_20100622_amended_sen_v94.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/asm/ab_0401-0450/ab_424_bill_20100913_enrolled.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/asm/ab_0401-0450/ab_424_vote_20100112_000006_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/asm/ab_0401-0450/ab_424_vote_20100121_000003_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/asm/ab_0401-0450/ab_424_vote_20100127_0418PM_asm_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/asm/ab_0401-0450/ab_424_vote_20100615_000001_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/asm/ab_0401-0450/ab_424_vote_20100715_000001_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/asm/ab_0401-0450/ab_424_vote_20100812_000002_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/asm/ab_0401-0450/ab_424_vote_20100825_1220PM_sen_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/asm/ab_0401-0450/ab_424_vote_20100831_0332PM_asm_floor.html

Bill Comments

feedback