CA AB423 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-01 - Died on inactive file.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-01 - Died on inactive file.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 7060 of the Government Code, relating to residential real property.
Title
Residential real property: rent control: withdrawal of accommodations.
Sponsors
Asm. Rob Bonta [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-05-11 - Assembly - AB 423 BONTA Assembly Third Reading (Y: 22 N: 34 NV: 24 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-04-05 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-01 | Assembly | Died on inactive file. |
2017-09-11 | Assembly | Ordered to inactive file at the request of Assembly Member Bonta. |
2017-09-11 | Assembly | Reconsideration granted. (Page 3097.) |
2017-05-11 | Assembly | Motion to reconsider on the next legislative day made by Assembly Member Bonta. |
2017-05-11 | Assembly | Read third time. Refused passage. (Ayes 22. Noes 34. Page 1493.). |
2017-04-06 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-04-05 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 4. Noes 3.) (April 5). |
2017-02-21 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on H. & C.D. |
2017-02-10 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 12. |
2017-02-09 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 7060 | Amended Code | Citation Text |