CA AB422 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 1 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-10-01 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 440, Statutes of 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 1 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-10-01 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 440, Statutes of 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 49557.2 of the Education Code, relating to public schools.
Title
School lunch program applications: health care notice.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-09-06 - Assembly - AB 422 NAZARIAN Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 77 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-09-03 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB422 Nazarian By Anderson (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-26 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-12 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Health (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-16 - Assembly - AB 422 NAZARIAN Assembly Third Reading (Y: 71 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2013-05-07 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-09-03 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB422 Nazarian By Anderson (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-26 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-12 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Health (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-16 - Assembly - AB 422 NAZARIAN Assembly Third Reading (Y: 71 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2013-05-07 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-10-01 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 440, Statutes of 2013. | |
2013-10-01 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2013-09-23 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. |
2013-09-06 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 77. Noes 1. Page 2907.). |
2013-09-04 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 6 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2013-09-03 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 2092.). |
2013-07-02 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2013-07-01 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 26). |
2013-06-12 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 12). Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2013-06-03 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2013-05-29 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on ED. and HEALTH. |
2013-05-16 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2013-05-16 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 71. Noes 2. Page 1451.) |
2013-05-08 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2013-05-07 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 19. Noes 0.) (May 7). |
2013-02-28 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2013-02-19 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 21. |
2013-02-15 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 49557.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |