CA AB421 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 3 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-03 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 3 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-03 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 2103, 2032, 2034, and 2036 of the Streets and Highways Code, relating to transportation, and making an appropriation therefor.
Title
Transportation finance: De Luz Community Services District.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-03 | Assembly | From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. |
2020-01-31 | Assembly | Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. |
2019-02-25 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2019-02-08 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 10. |
2019-02-07 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Streets and Highways Code | 2032 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Streets and Highways Code | 2034 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Streets and Highways Code | 2036 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Streets and Highways Code | 2103 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
California State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billStatusClient.xhtml?bill_id=201920200AB421 |
Text | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=201920200AB421 |