CA AB421 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-01 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-01 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 25323.5 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to hazardous substances.
Title
Hazardous substances: liability: responsible parties.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-04 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-01 | Assembly | From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. |
2018-01-31 | Assembly | Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. |
2017-04-24 | Assembly | In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2017-04-17 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2017-04-05 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 4. Noes 2.) (April 4). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2017-03-14 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2017-02-21 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on E.S. & T.M. and JUD. |
2017-02-10 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 12. |
2017-02-09 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 25323.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |