CA AB42 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-3)
Status: Passed on October 4 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-10-04 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 450, Statutes of 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-3)
Status: Passed on October 4 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-10-04 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 450, Statutes of 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add and repeal Section 5080.42 of the Public Resources Code, relating to state parks.
Title
State parks.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-09-06 - Assembly - AB 42 HUFFMAN Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-08-31 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB42 Huffman By Wolk (Y: 33 N: 2 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-08-25 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-07-11 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-14 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-19 - Assembly - AB 42 HUFFMAN Assembly Third Reading (Y: 75 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-05-11 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-03-22 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-08-31 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB42 Huffman By Wolk (Y: 33 N: 2 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-08-25 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-07-11 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-14 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-19 - Assembly - AB 42 HUFFMAN Assembly Third Reading (Y: 75 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-05-11 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-03-22 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-10-04 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 450, Statutes of 2011. | |
2011-10-04 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2011-09-14 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. | |
2011-09-06 | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 2894.). | |
2011-09-01 | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 3 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. | |
2011-08-31 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 33. Noes 2. Page 2193.). | |
2011-08-30 | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. | |
2011-08-29 | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (August 25). | |
2011-07-11 | In committee: Placed on APPR. suspense file. | |
2011-06-21 | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2011-06-20 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 14). | |
2011-06-02 | Referred to Com. on N.R. & W. | |
2011-05-19 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |
2011-05-19 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 1. Page 1446.) | |
2011-05-17 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2011-05-16 | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. | |
2011-05-12 | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 11). | |
2011-03-22 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (March 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2011-03-21 | Re-referred to Com. on W., P. & W. | |
2011-03-17 | Referred to Com. on W., P. & W. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on W., P. & W. Read second time and amended. | |
2010-12-07 | From printer. May be heard in committee January 6. | |
2010-12-06 | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Resources Code | 5080.42 | New Code | See Bill Text |