CA AB419 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - From Senate committee without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Section 12096.4.5 to the Government Code, relating to state government.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Governor's Office of Business and Economic Development: regulations.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-05-22 - Assembly - AB 419 KIM Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-05-13 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-21 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-11-30SenateFrom Senate committee without further action.
2015-06-16SenateIn committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
2015-06-04SenateReferred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
2015-05-22SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2015-05-22AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 1561.)
2015-05-14AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
2015-05-13AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 13).
2015-05-05AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on APPR.
2015-05-04AssemblyRead second time and amended.
2015-04-30AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 21).
2015-04-06AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on J., E.D., & E.
2015-03-26AssemblyReferred to Com. on J., E.D., & E. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on J., E.D., & E. Read second time and amended.
2015-02-20AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 22.
2015-02-19AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Government Code12096.4.5New CodeSee Bill Text
Government Code6303Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback