CA AB417 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-23 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 9, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add and repeal Section 1271.25 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to health facilities, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Acute psychiatric hospital: County of Ventura: outpatient mental health services.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-22 - Assembly - AB 417 LIMÓN Concurrence - Urgency Added (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-20 - Assembly - With recommendation: That Senate amendments be concurred in (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-19 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB417 Limón et al. By Jackson Urgency Clause (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-14 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-12 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-11 - Assembly - AB 417 WOOD Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-03 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Assembly - Do pass as amended, and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-23 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 9, Statutes of 2018.
2018-03-23 Approved by the Governor.
2018-03-22AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
2018-03-22AssemblyUrgency clause adopted. Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 69. Noes 0. Page 4377.).
2018-03-20AssemblyFrom committee: That the Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (March 20).
2018-03-19AssemblyJoint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 4299.)
2018-03-19AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on HEALTH. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
2018-03-19AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after March 22 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
2018-03-19SenateRead third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly.
2018-03-15SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-03-14SenateFrom committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
2018-03-14SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (March 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-03-12SenateRe-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
2018-03-12SenateRe-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(c).
2018-03-12SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-03-08SenateRead second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
2018-03-08SenateOrdered to second reading.
2018-03-08SenateFrom inactive file.
2017-09-13SenateOrdered to inactive file at the request of Senator Hernandez.
2017-08-24SenateOrdered to third reading.
2017-08-24SenateFrom Consent Calendar.
2017-08-22SenateRead second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
2017-08-21SenateFrom committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
2017-07-13SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (July 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-05-24SenateReferred to Com. on HEALTH.
2017-05-11SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2017-05-11AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1487.)
2017-05-04AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
2017-05-03AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 3).
2017-05-01AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-04-27AssemblyRead second time and amended.
2017-04-26AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 25).
2017-02-21AssemblyReferred to Com. on HEALTH.
2017-02-10AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 12.
2017-02-09AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations


California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback