CA AB415 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 28 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-09-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 340, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Section 18926.7 to the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to CalFresh.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

CalFresh: employment social enterprises.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-09-11 - Assembly - AB 415 CHIU Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-06 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB415 Chiu et al. By Leyva (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-20 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd AB415 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-27 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-30 - Assembly - AB 415 CHIU Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-09-28 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 340, Statutes of 2017.
2017-09-28 Approved by the Governor.
2017-09-18AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
2017-09-11AssemblySenate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 3104.).
2017-09-06AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 8 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
2017-09-06SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2496.).
2017-08-31SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2017-08-30SenateRead third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2017-08-30SenateOrdered to third reading.
2017-08-30SenateAction rescinded whereby the bill was read third time, passed, and to Assembly.
2017-08-21SenateIn Senate. Held at Desk.
2017-08-21AssemblyOrdered to the Senate.
2017-07-20AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 18 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
2017-07-20SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 2129.).
2017-07-18SenateRead second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
2017-07-17SenateFrom committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
2017-06-29SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-06-28SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 27).
2017-06-08SenateReferred to Com. on HUMAN S.
2017-05-30SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2017-05-30AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1857.)
2017-05-25AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
2017-05-24AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 24).
2017-05-18AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-05-17AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended.
2017-04-26AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-04-18AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on HUM. S.
2017-04-17AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HUM. S. Read second time and amended.
2017-04-04AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
2017-03-22AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on HUM. S.
2017-03-21AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HUM. S. Read second time and amended.
2017-03-20AssemblyReferred to Com. on HUM. S.
2017-02-10AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 12.
2017-02-09AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Civil Code43Amended CodeCitation Text
Welfare and Institutions Code11322.63New CodeSee Bill Text
Welfare and Institutions Code11323.26New CodeSee Bill Text
Welfare and Institutions Code18926.7New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback