CA AB415 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 7 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-10-07 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 612, Statutes of 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 7 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-10-07 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 612, Statutes of 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 2864 of the Public Utilities Code, relating to solar energy.
Title
Solar energy: water heating.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-09-06 - Assembly - AB 415 GARCIA Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-09-03 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB415 Garcia By Fuller (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-18 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-23 - Assembly - AB 415 GARCIA Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-05-15 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-29 - Assembly - Do pass and re-refer to Committee on Appropriations with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-04-29 - Assembly - Be referred to Committee on Utilities and Commerce (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-09-03 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB415 Garcia By Fuller (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-18 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-23 - Assembly - AB 415 GARCIA Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-05-15 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-29 - Assembly - Do pass and re-refer to Committee on Appropriations with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-04-29 - Assembly - Be referred to Committee on Utilities and Commerce (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-10-07 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 612, Statutes of 2013. | |
2013-10-07 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2013-09-23 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. |
2013-09-06 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 2906.). |
2013-09-04 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 6 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2013-09-03 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 2096.). |
2013-08-13 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2013-08-12 | Senate | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2013-06-25 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2013-06-24 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 18). |
2013-06-06 | Senate | Referred to Com. on E., U., & C. |
2013-05-23 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2013-05-23 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 1576.) |
2013-05-20 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2013-05-16 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 15). |
2013-04-30 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (April 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2013-04-29 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96. From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on U. & C. Re-referred. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 29). Re-referred to Com. on U. & C. |
2013-04-25 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on U. & C. |
2013-04-24 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on U. & C. Read second time and amended. |
2013-04-08 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2013-04-04 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on U. & C. |
2013-04-03 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on U. & C. Read second time and amended. |
2013-02-28 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on U. & C. and JUD. |
2013-02-19 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 21. |
2013-02-15 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Utilities Code | 2120 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Utilities Code | 2864 | Amended Code | Citation Text |