CA AB413 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 10 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-10-10 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 652, Statutes of 2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 10 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-10-10 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 652, Statutes of 2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 22500 of the Vehicle Code, relating to vehicles.
Title
Vehicles: stopping, standing, and parking.
Sponsors
Asm. Alex Lee [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-09-13 - Assembly - AB 413 Lee Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 57 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-09-12 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB413 Lee By Blakespear (Y: 29 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-09-01 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-08-21 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-07-11 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 13 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-22 - Assembly - AB 413 Lee Assembly Third Reading (Y: 53 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2023-05-10 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-20 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-09-12 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB413 Lee By Blakespear (Y: 29 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-09-01 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-08-21 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-07-11 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 13 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-22 - Assembly - AB 413 Lee Assembly Third Reading (Y: 53 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2023-05-10 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-20 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-10-10 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 652, Statutes of 2023. | |
2023-10-10 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2023-09-20 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. | |
2023-09-13 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 57. Noes 18. Page 3381.). |
2023-09-12 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. |
2023-09-12 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 29. Noes 7. Page 2640.). |
2023-09-11 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2023-09-08 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2023-09-05 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2023-09-01 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (September 1). |
2023-08-21 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR suspense file. |
2023-07-13 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2023-07-12 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 2.) (July 11). |
2023-06-22 | Senate | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2023-05-31 | Senate | Referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2023-05-23 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2023-05-22 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 56. Noes 16. Page 1692.) |
2023-05-11 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2023-05-10 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 3.) (May 10). |
2023-05-03 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2023-04-26 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2023-03-23 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2023-03-22 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2023-03-21 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 4.) (March 20). |
2023-02-09 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2023-02-03 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 5. |
2023-02-02 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Vehicle Code | 22500 | Amended Code | Citation Text |