CA AB413 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on October 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-12 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 800, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 234.1, 8266.1, 8423, 8801, 11300, 33426, 42920, 44324, 45391, 48660.1, 51266, 54690, 60901, and 69981 of, and to add Section 96 to, the Education Code, and to amend Sections 5087, 6025, 6027, 13825.2, 13825.4, 13825.5, 13826.11, and 13864 of the Penal Code, relating to youth.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Education: at-promise youth.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-08-26 - Assembly - AB 413 Jones-Sawyer Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 66 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-19 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB413 Jones-Sawyer et al. By Bradford (Y: 34 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Public Safety] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-09 - Assembly - AB 413 Jones-Sawyer Assembly Third Reading (Y: 65 N: 4 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Public Safety] (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-10-12 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 800, Statutes of 2019.
2019-10-12 Approved by the Governor.
2019-09-03AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
2019-08-26AssemblySenate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 66. Noes 4. Page 2832.).
2019-08-19AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 21 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
2019-08-19SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 34. Noes 2. Page 2204.).
2019-08-13SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-08-12SenateRead third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2019-06-19SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-06-18SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (June 18).
2019-06-05SenateIn committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
2019-06-05SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 5). Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
2019-05-22SenateReferred to Coms. on ED. and PUB. S.
2019-05-09SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2019-05-09AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 65. Noes 4. Page 1565.)
2019-04-25AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-04-24AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 23).
2019-04-11AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (April 10). Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
2019-04-11AssemblyCoauthors revised.
2019-04-02AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on ED.
2019-04-01AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended.
2019-03-21AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
2019-02-21AssemblyReferred to Coms. on ED. and PUB. S.
2019-02-08AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 10.
2019-02-07AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Education Code11300Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code234.1Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code33426Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code42920Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code44324Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code45391Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code48660.1Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code51266Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code54690Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code60901Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code69981Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code8266.1Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code8423Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code8801Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code96New CodeSee Bill Text
Penal Code13825.2Amended CodeCitation Text
Penal Code13825.4Amended CodeCitation Text
Penal Code13825.5Amended CodeCitation Text
Penal Code13826.11Amended CodeCitation Text
Penal Code13864Amended CodeCitation Text
Penal Code5087Amended CodeCitation Text
Penal Code6025Amended CodeCitation Text
Penal Code6027Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback