CA AB41 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on October 8 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-08 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 659, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 14051 of the Government Code, and to add Section 281.6 to the Public Utilities Code, relating to communications.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Broadband infrastructure deployment.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-09-10 - Assembly - AB 41 Wood Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-09-10 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB41 Wood et al. By McGuire (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-08-26 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-08-16 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-13 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-05 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Transportation] (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - Assembly - AB 41 Wood Assembly Third Reading (Y: 70 N: 1 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-26 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-14 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Transportation] (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-10-08 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 659, Statutes of 2021.
2021-10-08 Approved by the Governor.
2021-09-22 Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m.
2021-09-10AssemblySenate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 76. Noes 0.).
2021-09-10AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
2021-09-10SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0.).
2021-08-31SenateRead second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
2021-08-30SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 26).
2021-08-16SenateIn committee: Referred to suspense file.
2021-07-14SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2021-07-13SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (July 13).
2021-07-06SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (July 5). Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
2021-06-17SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on E., U. & C.
2021-06-17SenateIn committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
2021-06-09SenateReferred to Coms. on E., U. & C. and TRANS.
2021-06-02SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2021-06-01AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 70. Noes 1.)
2021-05-25AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2021-05-24AssemblyRead second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
2021-05-20AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (May 20).
2021-05-12AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2021-04-27AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 2.) (April 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2021-04-22AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on TRANS.
2021-04-21AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended.
2021-04-15AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. (Ayes 11. Noes 1.) (April 14). Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
2021-03-17AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on C. & C.
2021-03-16AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on C. & C. Read second time and amended.
2021-03-11AssemblyReferred to Coms. on C. & C. and TRANS.
2020-12-08AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee January 7.
2020-12-07AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Government Code14051Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Utilities Code281.6New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billStatusClient.xhtml?bill_id=202120220AB41
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202120220AB41#99INT
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202120220AB41#98AMD
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202120220AB41#97AMD
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202120220AB41#96AMD
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202120220AB41#95AMD
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202120220AB41#94AMD
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202120220AB41#93AMD
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202120220AB41#92ENR
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202120220AB41#91CHP
Roll Callhttp://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billVotesClient.xhtml?bill_id=202120220AB41

Bill Comments

feedback