CA AB408 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 20 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-20 - From committee: Without further action pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a).
Pending: Assembly Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 20 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-20 - From committee: Without further action pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a).
Pending: Assembly Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 1250.410 of the Code of Civil Procedure, relating to eminent domain.
Title
Eminent domain: final offer of compensation.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-20 | Assembly | From committee: Without further action pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a). |
2017-03-20 | Assembly | In committee: Set, final hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2017-03-14 | Assembly | In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2017-03-07 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2017-02-21 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2017-02-10 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 12. |
2017-02-09 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Code of Civil Procedure | 1250.410 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
California State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billStatusClient.xhtml?bill_id=201720180AB408 |
Text | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=201720180AB408 |