CA AB406 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on September 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 386, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Section 3308 to the Unemployment Insurance Code, relating to disability compensation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Disability compensation: paid family leave: application in non-English languages.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-09-10 - Assembly - AB 406 Limón Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-09 - Senate - Special Consent AB406 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-30 - Senate - Result (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-30 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-01 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - Assembly - AB 406 Limón Assembly Third Reading (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-09-30 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 386, Statutes of 2019.
2019-09-30 Approved by the Governor.
2019-09-18AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
2019-09-10AssemblySenate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 3295.).
2019-09-10AssemblyAssembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 3252.)
2019-09-09AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 11 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
2019-09-09SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2711.).
2019-09-04SenateOrdered to special consent calendar.
2019-08-30SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-08-30SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 30).
2019-07-01SenateIn committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2019-06-20SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-06-19SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 19).
2019-06-06SenateReferred to Com. on L., P.E. & R.
2019-05-24SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2019-05-23AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1866.)
2019-05-20AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-05-16AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (May 16).
2019-05-01AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2019-04-24AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-04-23AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on INS.
2019-04-22AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on INS. Read second time and amended.
2019-03-27AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on INS.
2019-03-26AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on INS. Read second time and amended.
2019-03-25AssemblyReferred to Com. on INS.
2019-02-08AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 10.
2019-02-07AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Unemployment Insurance Code3308New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback