CA AB406 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 31 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-07-10 - In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend, repeal, and add Section 47604 of the Education Code, relating to charter schools.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Charter schools: operation.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-31 - Assembly - AB 406 MCCARTY Assembly Third Reading (Y: 50 N: 24 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-10 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-07-10SenateIn committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
2017-06-27SenateIn committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
2017-06-14SenateReferred to Com. on ED.
2017-06-01SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2017-05-31AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 50. Noes 24. Page 1989.)
2017-05-18AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2017-05-17AssemblyRead second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
2017-05-16AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (May 10).
2017-03-27AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on ED.
2017-03-23AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended.
2017-03-23AssemblyReferred to Com. on ED.
2017-02-10AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 12.
2017-02-09AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Education Code47604New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback