CA AB406 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 23 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-02 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 23 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-02 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Article 5.3 (commencing with Section 44540) to Chapter 3 of Part 25 of Division 3 of Title 2 of the Education Code, relating to school personnel.
Title
School personnel: Classified School Employee Training
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-04-01 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-02 | From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | |
2010-01-31 | Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. | |
2009-05-28 | In committee: Set, second hearing. Held under submission. | |
2009-04-23 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | |
2009-04-15 | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2009-04-14 | Read second time and amended. | |
2009-04-13 | From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 1.) (April 1). | |
2009-03-09 | Referred to Com. on ED. | |
2009-02-24 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 26. | |
2009-02-23 | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 44540 | New Code | See Bill Text |