CA AB403 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 5 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-05 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 2, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Article 11 (commencing with Section 9149.30) to Chapter 1.5 of Part 1 of Division 2 of Title 2 of the Government Code, relating to the Legislature, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Legislature: Legislative Employee Whistleblower Protection Act.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-02-05 - Assembly - AB 403 MELENDEZ Concurrence - Urgency Added (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB403 Melendez et al. By Bates Urgency Clause (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-26 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-13 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-11 - Assembly - AB 403 MELENDEZ Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-03 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-14 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Rules] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-02-05 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 2, Statutes of 2018.
2018-02-05 Approved by the Governor.
2018-02-05AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
2018-02-05AssemblyUrgency clause adopted. Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 3924.).
2018-02-01AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after February 3 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
2018-02-01SenateRead third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 3237.).
2018-01-30SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-01-29SenateRead third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2018-01-25SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-01-24SenateOrdered to second reading.
2018-01-24SenateWithdrawn from committee.
2018-01-23SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS.
2018-01-03SenateRe-referred to Com. on RLS.
2018-01-03SenateWithdrawn from committee.
2017-09-01SenateIn committee: Held under submission.
2017-06-26SenateIn committee: Referred to suspense file.
2017-06-13SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-05-24SenateReferred to Com. on JUD.
2017-05-11SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2017-05-11AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1487.)
2017-05-04AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
2017-05-03AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 3).
2017-04-24AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-03-14AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on RLS. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (March 14). Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
2017-02-21AssemblyReferred to Coms. on JUD. and RLS.
2017-02-10AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 12.
2017-02-09AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Government Code9149.30New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback