CA AB403 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-03 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-03 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 118286 of the Health and Safety Code, and to repeal and add Article 3.3 (commencing with Section 47115) of Chapter 1 of Part 7 of Division 30 of the Public Resources Code, relating to solid waste.
Title
Solid waste: home-generated sharps.
Sponsors
Asm. Mark Stone [D] | Sen. Susan Eggman [D] |
Roll Calls
2013-04-16 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-03 | Assembly | From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. |
2014-01-31 | Assembly | Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. |
2013-05-08 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2013-04-22 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2013-04-18 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2013-04-17 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (April 16). |
2013-04-09 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M. |
2013-04-08 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E.S. & T.M. Read second time and amended. |
2013-03-22 | Assembly | Measure version as amended on March 19 corrected. |
2013-03-20 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M. |
2013-03-19 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on E.S. & T.M. and JUD. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E.S. & T.M. Read second time and amended. |
2013-02-19 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 21. |
2013-02-15 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 118286 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 47115 | Amended Code | Citation Text |