CA AB402 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 27 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-09-01 - Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Laird.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Articles 1.2 (commencing with Section 350) and 1.3 (commencing with Section 360) to Chapter 2 of Part 1 of Division 1 of the Unemployment Insurance Code, relating to unemployment insurance, and making an appropriation therefor.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Office of the Claimant Advocate and Stakeholder Advisory Group.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-08-26 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-15 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-05 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-27 - Assembly - AB 402 Wicks Assembly Third Reading (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-09-01SenateOrdered to inactive file at the request of Senator Laird.
2021-08-30SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2021-08-26SenateRead second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
2021-08-26SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 26).
2021-07-15SenateIn committee: Referred to suspense file.
2021-07-06SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (July 5). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2021-06-29SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on L., P.E. & R.
2021-06-16SenateIn committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
2021-06-09SenateReferred to Com. on L., P.E. & R.
2021-05-28SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2021-05-27AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0.)
2021-05-24AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2021-05-20AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 20).
2021-05-12AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2021-04-29AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (April 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2021-04-22AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on INS.
2021-04-21AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on INS. Read second time and amended.
2021-02-12AssemblyReferred to Com. on INS.
2021-02-04AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 6.
2021-02-03AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Unemployment Insurance Code350New CodeSee Bill Text
Unemployment Insurance Code360New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback