CA AB402 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on October 9 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-01-12 - Stricken from file.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on October 9 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-01-12 - Stricken from file.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 144.9 to the Labor Code, relating to occupational safety and health.
Title
Occupational safety and health standards: plume.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-09-11 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB402 Thurmond By Hernandez (Y: 28 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-01 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-10 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-28 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-30 - Assembly - AB 402 THURMOND Assembly Third Reading (Y: 55 N: 21 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-15 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-01 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-10 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-28 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-30 - Assembly - AB 402 THURMOND Assembly Third Reading (Y: 55 N: 21 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-15 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-12 | Stricken from file. | |
2018-01-03 | Consideration of Governor's veto pending. | |
2017-10-09 | Vetoed by Governor. | |
2017-09-20 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m. |
2017-09-11 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2017-09-11 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 28. Noes 12. Page 2663.). |
2017-09-05 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-09-01 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (September 1). |
2017-07-10 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2017-06-28 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 3. Noes 1.) (June 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-06-08 | Senate | Referred to Com. on L. & I.R. |
2017-05-30 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2017-05-30 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 55. Noes 21. Page 1785.) |
2017-04-06 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-04-05 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (April 5). |
2017-03-16 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (March 15). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-02-21 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on L. & E. |
2017-02-10 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 12. |
2017-02-09 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Labor Code | 144.9 | New Code | See Bill Text |