CA AB399 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 11 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-10-11 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 240, Statutes of 2009.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 11 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-10-11 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 240, Statutes of 2009.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 22708 of the Education Code, and to amend Section 20731 of, and to add Sections 20969, 75103.6, and 75605.1 to, the Government Code, relating to public employee benefits.
Title
Public employee benefits.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-09-10 - Assembly - AB 399 BROWNLEY Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 57 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2009-09-08 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB399 Brownley By Correa (Y: 33 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2009-09-04 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2009-06-22 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB399 Brownley Correa (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2009-06-08 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2009-05-04 - Assembly - AB 399 BROWNLEY Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2009-04-22 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2009-04-01 - Assembly - Do pass and re-refer to Committee on Appropriations with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2009-09-08 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB399 Brownley By Correa (Y: 33 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2009-09-04 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2009-06-22 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB399 Brownley Correa (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2009-06-08 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2009-05-04 - Assembly - AB 399 BROWNLEY Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2009-04-22 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2009-04-01 - Assembly - Do pass and re-refer to Committee on Appropriations with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-10-11 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 240, Statutes of 2009. | |
2009-10-11 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2009-09-25 | Enrolled and to the Governor at 5 p.m. | |
2009-09-10 | Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 57. Noes 22. Page 3264.) | |
2009-09-09 | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. | |
2009-09-08 | Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 33. Noes 6. Page 2291.) | |
2009-09-04 | From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on P.E. & R. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) Re-referred to Com. on P.E. & R. From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (September 4). Ordered to third reading. | |
2009-09-02 | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10. | |
2009-08-31 | Read second time. To third reading. | |
2009-08-27 | Read third time, amended. To second reading. | |
2009-06-30 | Read second time. To third reading. | |
2009-06-29 | Action rescinded whereby the bill was read third time, urgency clause adopted, passed, and to Assembly. Read third time, amended. To second reading. | |
2009-06-24 | In Senate. Held at Desk. | |
2009-06-24 | Ordered returned to Senate. | |
2009-06-22 | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after June 24 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. | |
2009-06-22 | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed and to Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 1375.) | |
2009-06-17 | Read second time, amended, and to third reading. | |
2009-06-16 | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and be amended. | |
2009-06-08 | From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 8). | |
2009-05-26 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on P.E. & R. | |
2009-05-14 | Referred to Com. on P.E. & R. | |
2009-05-04 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |
2009-05-04 | Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 1240.) | |
2009-04-27 | Read second time. To Consent Calendar. | |
2009-04-23 | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (April 22). | |
2009-04-01 | From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. Re-referred. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (April 1). | |
2009-03-09 | Referred to Com. on P.E.,R. & S.S. | |
2009-02-24 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 26. | |
2009-02-23 | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 22708 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 20731 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 20969 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Government Code | 75103.6 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Government Code | 75605.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |