CA AB398 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-16 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 90, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-16 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 90, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 1810 of the Vehicle Code, relating to the Department of Motor Vehicles.
Title
Department of Motor Vehicles: records.
Sponsors
Asm. Edwin Chau [D] | Asm. Vince Fong [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-06-28 - Assembly - AB 398 Fong Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - Senate - Consent Calendar AB398 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-08 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-06 - Assembly - AB 398 Fong Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - Senate - Consent Calendar AB398 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-08 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-06 - Assembly - AB 398 Fong Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-16 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 90, Statutes of 2021. | |
2021-07-16 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2021-07-05 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m. | |
2021-06-28 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 2132.). |
2021-06-24 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after June 26 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2021-06-24 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1633.). |
2021-06-22 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2021-06-21 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2021-06-08 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (June 8). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-05-26 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2021-05-06 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2021-05-06 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1335.) |
2021-04-29 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2021-04-28 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (April 28). |
2021-04-14 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2021-03-23 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (March 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-03-11 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2021-03-10 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended. |
2021-02-12 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2021-02-04 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 6. |
2021-02-03 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Vehicle Code | 1810 | Amended Code | Citation Text |