CA AB398 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 2 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-01 - Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
Pending: Senate Governance and Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 2 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-01 - Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
Pending: Senate Governance and Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Part 1.5 (commencing with Section 16555) to Division 7 of the Business and Professions Code and to add and repeal Part 25.5 (commencing with Section 47100) of Division 2 of the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to local government finance, and making an appropriation therefor.
Title
COVID-19 Local Government and School Recovery and Relief Act.
Sponsors
Asm. Kansen Chu [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-02 - Assembly - AB 398 Chu Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-01 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2020-06-17 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2020-05-29 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2020-05-29 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. |
2020-05-27 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2019-06-25 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2019-06-03 | Senate | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2019-05-02 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2019-05-02 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 1474.) |
2019-04-25 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2019-04-24 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (April 24). |
2019-04-22 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-04-11 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended. |
2019-04-11 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (April 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-04-02 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2019-04-01 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended. |
2019-03-26 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2019-03-25 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended. |
2019-03-21 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2019-02-07 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 9. |
2019-02-06 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 16555 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 47100 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |