CA AB398 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on July 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-25 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 135, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend, repeal, and add Sections 38501, 38562, and 38594 of, and to add and repeal Sections 38505.5, 38590.1, 38591.1, 38591.2, 38591.3, 38592.5, and 38592.6 of, the Health and Safety Code, to add Section 4213.05 to, to add Article 3 (commencing with Section 4229) to Chapter 1.5 of Part 2 of Division 4 of, and to repeal Chapter 1.5 (commencing with Section 4210) of Part 2 of Division 4 of, the Public Resources Code, and to amend Section 6377.1 of the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to public resources, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

California Global Warming Solutions Act of 2006: market-based compliance mechanisms: fire prevention fees: sales and use tax manufacturing exemption.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-07-17 - Assembly - AB 398 GARCIA, E. Concurrence - Urgency Added (Y: 55 N: 22 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-17 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB398 Eduardo Garcia By De León Urgency Clause (Y: 28 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-17 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-13 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-01 - Assembly - AB 398 GARCIA, E. Assembly Third Reading (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-26 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-03 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-07-25 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 135, Statutes of 2017.
2017-07-25 Approved by the Governor.
2017-07-18AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 12:45 p.m.
2017-07-17AssemblyUrgency clause adopted. Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 55. Noes 22. Page 2588.).
2017-07-17AssemblyAssembly Rule 63 suspended. (Ayes 50. Noes 19. Page 2585.)
2017-07-17AssemblyAssembly Rule 77 suspended.
2017-07-17AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after July 19 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
2017-07-17SenateRead third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 28. Noes 12. Page 2074.).
2017-07-17SenateOrdered to third reading.
2017-07-17SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (July 17).
2017-07-14SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-07-13SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (July 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-07-13SenateJoint Rule 62(a) suspended. (Ayes 27. Noes 11. Page 2012.)
2017-07-10SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on EQ.
2017-06-14SenateReferred to Com. on EQ.
2017-06-05SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2017-06-01AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 2085.)
2017-05-30AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2017-05-26AssemblyRead second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
2017-05-26AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 26).
2017-05-17AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2017-04-18AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-04-17AssemblyRead second time and amended.
2017-04-06AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 3).
2017-03-29AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
2017-03-28AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended.
2017-03-13AssemblyCoauthors revised.
2017-02-21AssemblyReferred to Com. on NAT. RES.
2017-02-10AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 12.
2017-02-09AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Health and Safety Code38501New CodeSee Bill Text
Health and Safety Code38562New CodeSee Bill Text
Health and Safety Code38594New CodeSee Bill Text
Health and Safety Code39518New CodeSee Bill Text
Health and Safety Code39619.10New CodeSee Bill Text
Health and Safety Code39720Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Resources Code4210Repealed CodeCitation Text
Public Resources Code4213.05New CodeSee Bill Text
Revenue and Taxation Code6377.1Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback