CA AB395 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-09-11 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 223, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-09-11 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 223, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 11220, 11839.1, 11839.2, 11839.3, 11839.5, and 11839.6 of the Health and Safety Code, and to amend Section 14021.6 of the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to substance use treatment providers.
Title
Substance use treatment providers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-08-24 - Assembly - AB 395 BOCANEGRA Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-08-21 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB395 Bocanegra By Beall (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-26 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-07 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - Assembly - AB 395 BOCANEGRA Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-08-21 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB395 Bocanegra By Beall (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-26 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-07 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - Assembly - AB 395 BOCANEGRA Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-09-11 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 223, Statutes of 2017. | |
2017-09-11 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2017-08-30 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. |
2017-08-24 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 2754.). |
2017-08-22 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 24 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2017-08-21 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 1. Page 2178.). |
2017-07-10 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-07-06 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2017-06-27 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-06-26 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 26). |
2017-06-12 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-06-08 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 7). |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2017-05-04 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2017-05-04 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 1389.) |
2017-04-27 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2017-04-26 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (April 26). |
2017-03-29 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (March 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-03-21 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2017-03-20 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended. |
2017-03-06 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2017-03-02 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended. |
2017-02-21 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2017-02-10 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 12. |
2017-02-09 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 11220 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 11839.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 11839.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 11839.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 11839.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 11839.6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 14021.6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |