CA AB394 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on October 3 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-03 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 440, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on October 3 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-03 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 440, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 12012.89 to the Government Code, relating to tribal gaming, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
Tribal gaming: compact ratification.
Sponsors
Asm. Devon Mathis [R] | Sen. Andy Vidak [R] | Asm. Jim Frazier [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-09-15 - Assembly - AB 394 Mathis Concurrence - Urgency Added (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-14 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB394 Mathis et al. By Vidak Urgency Clause (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-07 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - Assembly - AB 394 MEDINA Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-14 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB394 Mathis et al. By Vidak Urgency Clause (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-07 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - Assembly - AB 394 MEDINA Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-10-03 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 440, Statutes of 2017. | |
2017-10-03 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2017-09-26 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. |
2017-09-15 | Assembly | Urgency clause adopted. Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 3521.). |
2017-09-15 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. |
2017-09-14 | Senate | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2937.). |
2017-09-13 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-09-12 | Senate | Ordered to second reading. |
2017-09-12 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. |
2017-09-05 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2017-09-01 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2017-09-01 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-08-31 | Senate | Ordered to second reading. |
2017-08-31 | Senate | From inactive file. |
2017-07-13 | Senate | Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Mendoza. |
2017-06-27 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-06-26 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2017-06-07 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 7). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2017-05-04 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2017-05-04 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 1389.) |
2017-04-27 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2017-04-26 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (April 26). |
2017-04-03 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-03-30 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2017-03-29 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (March 28). |
2017-02-21 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. |
2017-02-10 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 12. |
2017-02-09 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 89012 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Government Code | 12012.89 | New Code | See Bill Text |