CA AB393 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on February 2 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-05-20 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 10202 of, and to add Section 10206.5 to, the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to childcare, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Early Childhood Development Act of 2020.

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-20AssemblyIn committee: Held under submission.
2021-05-05AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2021-04-22AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 21). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2021-04-22AssemblyCoauthors revised.
2021-02-12AssemblyReferred to Com. on HUM. S.
2021-02-03AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 5.
2021-02-02AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Welfare and Institutions Code10202Amended CodeCitation Text
Welfare and Institutions Code10206.5New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback