CA AB390 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on October 2 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-02 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 402, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on October 2 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-02 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 402, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 21456 of the Vehicle Code, relating to pedestrians.
Title
Pedestrian crossing signals.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-09-11 - Assembly - AB 390 SANTIAGO Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-07 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB390 Santiago et al. By Beall (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-01 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-08-28 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-11 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-11 - Assembly - AB 390 SANTIAGO Assembly Third Reading (Y: 76 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-08 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-07 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB390 Santiago et al. By Beall (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-01 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-08-28 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-11 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-11 - Assembly - AB 390 SANTIAGO Assembly Third Reading (Y: 76 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-08 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-10-02 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 402, Statutes of 2017. | |
2017-10-02 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2017-09-18 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. |
2017-09-11 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 3129.). |
2017-09-07 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 9 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2017-09-07 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2580.). |
2017-09-05 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-09-01 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (September 1). |
2017-08-28 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2017-08-21 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2017-07-13 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-07-12 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (July 11). |
2017-06-12 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on T. & H. |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Referred to Com. on T. & H. |
2017-05-11 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2017-05-11 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 1. Page 1482.) |
2017-05-10 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-05-09 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 1.) (May 8). |
2017-04-17 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2017-04-17 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2017-03-29 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2017-02-21 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2017-02-10 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 12. |
2017-02-09 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Vehicle Code | 21456 | Amended Code | Citation Text |