CA AB39 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 23 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-23 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 227, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 23 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-23 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 227, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Article 8 (commencing with Section 92687) to Chapter 6 of Part 57 of Division 9 of Title 3 of the Education Code, relating to climate change.
Title
California-China Climate Institute.
Sponsors
Asm. Edwin Chau [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-09-09 - Assembly - AB 39 Chau Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 56 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2021-09-08 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB39 Chau By Skinner (Y: 29 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-08-26 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-21 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-14 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-09 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Environmental Quality] (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-13 - Assembly - AB 39 Chau Assembly Third Reading (Y: 50 N: 16 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-14 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Natural Resources] (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-09-08 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB39 Chau By Skinner (Y: 29 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-08-26 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-21 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-14 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-09 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Environmental Quality] (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-13 - Assembly - AB 39 Chau Assembly Third Reading (Y: 50 N: 16 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-14 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Natural Resources] (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-09-23 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 227, Statutes of 2021. | |
2021-09-23 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2021-09-17 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. | |
2021-09-09 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 56. Noes 12. Page 2982.). |
2021-09-08 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. |
2021-09-08 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 29. Noes 8. Page 2496.). |
2021-09-02 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-09-01 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2021-08-30 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-08-26 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2021-08-26 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 26). |
2021-06-21 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR suspense file. |
2021-06-14 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (June 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-06-09 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on E.Q. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (June 9). Re-referred to Com. on E.Q. |
2021-05-27 | Action rescinded whereby the bill was referred to Com. on N.R. & W. | |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on ED., E.Q. and N.R. & W. |
2021-05-13 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2021-05-13 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 50. Noes 16. Page 1407.) |
2021-04-29 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-04-28 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 4.) (April 28). |
2021-04-14 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-03-26 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2021-03-25 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2021-03-24 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. (Ayes 8. Noes 4.) (March 24). |
2021-01-11 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on HIGHER ED. and NAT. RES. |
2020-12-08 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee January 7. |
2020-12-07 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 92687 | New Code | See Bill Text |