CA AB385 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 26 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-08-30 - Read third time. Refused passage. (Ayes 15. Noes 19. Page 5528.).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 26 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-08-30 - Read third time. Refused passage. (Ayes 15. Noes 19. Page 5528.).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 6808 to the Government Code, and to repeal Sections 1, 2, 3, 4, and 5 of the Daylight Saving Time Act, an initiative measure approved at the November 8, 1949, special election, relating to Daylight Saving Time.
Title
Daylight Saving Time.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-08-30 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB385 Chu By Gaines (Y: 15 N: 19 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-08-23 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB385 Chu By Gaines (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-23 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB385 Chu By Gaines (Y: 17 N: 17 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-08-11 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-01 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-13 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-15 - Senate - Set, first hearing. Failed passage in Committee. Reconsideration granted (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-15 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 2 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-05-26 - Assembly - AB 385 CHU Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-05-20 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-04-27 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-22 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Natural Resources (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-23 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB385 Chu By Gaines (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-23 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB385 Chu By Gaines (Y: 17 N: 17 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-08-11 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-01 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-13 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-15 - Senate - Set, first hearing. Failed passage in Committee. Reconsideration granted (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-15 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 2 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-05-26 - Assembly - AB 385 CHU Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-05-20 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-04-27 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-22 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Natural Resources (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-08-30 | Senate | Read third time. Refused passage. (Ayes 15. Noes 19. Page 5528.). |
2016-08-23 | Senate | Read third time. Refused passage. (Ayes 17. Noes 17. Page 5312.). Motion to reconsider made by Senator Gaines. Reconsideration granted. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5312.) |
2016-08-22 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-08-19 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2016-08-15 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-08-11 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (August 11). |
2016-08-01 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2016-06-27 | Senate | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2016-06-14 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 2.) (June 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-05-19 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on E., U., & C. |
2016-05-11 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2016-05-09 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on E.Q. |
2015-07-01 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on E.Q. |
2015-06-30 | Senate | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2015-06-04 | Senate | Referred to Com. on E.Q. |
2015-05-26 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2015-05-26 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 1594.) |
2015-05-21 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2015-05-20 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (May 20). |
2015-04-30 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-04-29 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2015-04-28 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 27). |
2015-04-23 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 22). Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2015-04-15 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2015-04-14 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. Read second time and amended. |
2015-04-06 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2015-03-26 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on L. GOV. and NAT. RES. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. Read second time and amended. |
2015-02-19 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 21. |
2015-02-18 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 53000 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 6808 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Health and Safety Code | 40280 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 43209.3 | New Code | See Bill Text |