CA AB384 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-01 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-01 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 4883, 4884, 26001, and 26130 of the Business and Professions Code, relating to cannabis.
Title
Cannabis and cannabis products: animals: veterinary medicine.
Sponsors
Asm. Ash Kalra [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-13 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-01 | Assembly | From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. |
2022-01-31 | Assembly | Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. |
2021-05-20 | Assembly | In committee: Held under submission. |
2021-04-28 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2021-04-19 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-04-15 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2021-04-14 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (April 13). |
2021-04-05 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on B. & P. |
2021-03-30 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & P. Read second time and amended. |
2021-02-12 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on B. & P. |
2021-02-03 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 5. |
2021-02-02 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 26001 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 26130 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 4883 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 4884 | Amended Code | Citation Text |