CA AB381 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Vetoed on October 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-01-12 - Stricken from file.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on October 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-01-12 - Stricken from file.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Article 5.4 (commencing with Section 4630) to Chapter 1 of Division 3 of the Vehicle Code, relating to vehicles.
Title
Vehicle registration: Voluntary Deaf or Hard of Hearing Notification Program: establishment.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-09-15 - Assembly - AB 381 Calderon Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-14 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB381 Calderon et al. By McGuire (Y: 30 N: 4 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-01 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-10 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-20 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-30 - Assembly - AB 381 CALDERON Assembly Third Reading (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-26 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-20 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-14 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB381 Calderon et al. By McGuire (Y: 30 N: 4 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-01 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-10 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-20 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-30 - Assembly - AB 381 CALDERON Assembly Third Reading (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-26 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-20 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-12 | Stricken from file. | |
2018-01-03 | Consideration of Governor's veto pending. | |
2017-10-05 | Vetoed by Governor. | |
2017-09-26 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. |
2017-09-15 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 3521.). |
2017-09-15 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. |
2017-09-14 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2934.). |
2017-09-11 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-09-08 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2017-09-05 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-09-01 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2017-09-01 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (September 1). |
2017-07-10 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2017-06-21 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 1.) (June 20). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-06-08 | Senate | Referred to Com. on T. & H. |
2017-05-30 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2017-05-30 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 1816.) |
2017-05-26 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-05-26 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 26). |
2017-04-05 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2017-03-21 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (March 20). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-03-21 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2017-02-21 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2017-02-10 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 12. |
2017-02-09 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Vehicle Code | 4630 | New Code | See Bill Text |