CA AB381 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 13 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-08-13 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 99, Statutes of 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 859 and 4231.5 of the Probate Code, relating to estates and trusts.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Estates and trusts: undue influence and elder abuse.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-07-03 - Assembly - AB 381 CHAU Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-07-01 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB381 Chau By Corbett (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-04 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-15 - Assembly - AB 381 CHAU Assembly Third Reading (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-04-02 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-08-13 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 99, Statutes of 2013.
2013-08-13 Approved by the Governor.
2013-08-01AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 2:45 p.m.
2013-07-03AssemblySenate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 2285.).
2013-07-01AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after July 3 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
2013-07-01SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 1602.).
2013-06-05SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2013-06-04SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 4).
2013-05-24SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD.
2013-04-25SenateReferred to Com. on JUD.
2013-04-15SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2013-04-15AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 915.)
2013-04-11AssemblyRead third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 877.)
2013-04-03AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2013-04-02AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on JUD. From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 2).
2013-04-01AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended.
2013-02-28AssemblyReferred to Com. on JUD.
2013-02-15AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 17.
2013-02-14AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Probate Code4231.5Amended CodeCitation Text
Probate Code859Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/cgi-bin/postquery?bill_number=ab_381&sess=1314&house=A
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0351-0400/ab_381_bill_20130214_introduced.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0351-0400/ab_381_bill_20130401_amended_asm_v98.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0351-0400/ab_381_bill_20130411_amended_asm_v97.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0351-0400/ab_381_bill_20130524_amended_sen_v96.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0351-0400/ab_381_bill_20130710_enrolled.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0351-0400/ab_381_bill_20130813_chaptered.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0351-0400/ab_381_vote_20130402_000002_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0351-0400/ab_381_vote_20130415_0105PM_asm_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0351-0400/ab_381_vote_20130604_000002_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0351-0400/ab_381_vote_20130701_0105PM_sen_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0351-0400/ab_381_vote_20130703_1025AM_asm_floor.html

Bill Comments 750

feedback