CA AB380 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 31 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-08-25 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 31 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-08-25 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Article 5.5 (commencing with Section 4564) to Chapter 8 of Part 2 of Division 4 of the Public Resources Code, relating to resources.
Title
Resources: watersheds.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-07-11 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-28 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-31 - Assembly - AB 380 CHESBRO Assembly Third Reading (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-05-27 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-05 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and re-refer to Committee on Appropriations with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-03-21 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Water, Parks and Wildlife (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-06-28 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-31 - Assembly - AB 380 CHESBRO Assembly Third Reading (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-05-27 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-05 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and re-refer to Committee on Appropriations with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-03-21 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Water, Parks and Wildlife (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-08-25 | In committee: Held under submission. | |
2011-07-11 | In committee: Placed on APPR. suspense file. | |
2011-06-28 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (June 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2011-06-22 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W. | |
2011-06-08 | Referred to Com. on N.R. & W. | |
2011-05-31 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |
2011-05-31 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 1650.) | |
2011-05-27 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 27). Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2011-05-04 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | |
2011-04-12 | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2011-04-11 | Read second time and amended. | |
2011-04-07 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 5). | |
2011-03-30 | Re-referred to Com. on W., P. & W. | |
2011-03-29 | Read second time and amended. | |
2011-03-25 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on W., P. & W. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (March 21). | |
2011-02-24 | Referred to Coms. on NAT. RES. and W., P. & W. | |
2011-02-15 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 17. | |
2011-02-14 | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Resources Code | 4564 | New Code | See Bill Text |