CA AB38 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 25 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-09-01 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 25 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-09-01 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Chapter 12 (commencing with Section 11900) to Part 1 of Division 3 of Title 2 of the Government Code, relating to state government.
Title
Light pollution control.
Sponsors
Asm. Alex Lee [D] | Sen. Josh Becker [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-08-14 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-27 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-05-25 - Assembly - AB 38 Lee Assembly Third Reading (Y: 65 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2023-05-18 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 11 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-03-28 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 15 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-06-27 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-05-25 - Assembly - AB 38 Lee Assembly Third Reading (Y: 65 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2023-05-18 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 11 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-03-28 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 15 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-09-01 | Senate | In committee: Held under submission. |
2023-08-14 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR suspense file. |
2023-06-28 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2023-06-27 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 2.) (June 27). |
2023-06-07 | Senate | Referred to Com. on G.O. |
2023-05-26 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2023-05-25 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 65. Noes 5. Page 1788.) |
2023-05-22 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2023-05-18 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2023-05-18 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 11. Noes 3.) (May 18). |
2023-04-19 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2023-03-30 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2023-03-29 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2023-03-28 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 15. Noes 2.) (March 28). |
2023-01-26 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on B. & P. |
2022-12-06 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee January 5. |
2022-12-05 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 11900 | New Code | See Bill Text |