CA AB378 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-01 - Died on inactive file.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-01 - Died on inactive file.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 38562.5 of, and to add Sections 38562.6 and 38567 to, the Health and Safety Code, relating to air pollution.
Title
Greenhouse gases, criteria air pollutants, and toxic air contaminants.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-01 - Assembly - AB 378 GARCIA, C. Assembly Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 39 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-05-26 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 11 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-26 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 11 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-01 | Assembly | Died on inactive file. |
2017-09-11 | Assembly | Ordered to inactive file at the request of Assembly Member Cristina Garcia. |
2017-09-11 | Assembly | Reconsideration granted. (Page 3097.) |
2017-06-01 | Assembly | Motion to reconsider on the next legislative day made by Assembly Member Cristina Garcia. |
2017-06-01 | Assembly | Read third time. Refused passage. (Ayes 35. Noes 39. Page 2088.). |
2017-05-30 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-05-30 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Ayes 52. Noes 24. Page 1776.) |
2017-05-30 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2017-05-26 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 11. Noes 6.) (May 26). |
2017-05-03 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2017-04-25 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 3.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-04-19 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2017-04-18 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended. |
2017-02-21 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2017-02-10 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 12. |
2017-02-09 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 38562.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 38562.6 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Health and Safety Code | 38567 | New Code | See Bill Text |