CA AB375 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 55, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 55, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Title 1.81.5 (commencing with Section 1798.100) to Part 4 of Division 3 of the Civil Code, relating to privacy.
Title
Privacy: personal information: businesses.
Sponsors
Asm. Edwin Chau [D] | Sen. Bob Hertzberg [D] | Sen. Bill Dodd [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-06-28 - Assembly - AB 375 CHAU Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-28 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB375 Chau et al. By Hertzberg (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-28 - Senate - That the measure be returned to Senate Floor for consideration. Ordered to third reading (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-26 - Senate - Pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10, that the measure be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations pursuant to Joint Rule 10.5 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-18 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Rules] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-18 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-11 - Assembly - AB 375 CHAU Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-02 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-28 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB375 Chau et al. By Hertzberg (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-28 - Senate - That the measure be returned to Senate Floor for consideration. Ordered to third reading (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-26 - Senate - Pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10, that the measure be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations pursuant to Joint Rule 10.5 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-18 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Rules] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-18 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-11 - Assembly - AB 375 CHAU Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-02 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-28 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 55, Statutes of 2018. | |
2018-06-28 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2018-06-28 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 1:30 p.m. |
2018-06-28 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 6032.). |
2018-06-28 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Ayes 54. Noes 22. Page 6031.) |
2018-06-28 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Ayes 54. Noes 22. Page 6031.) |
2018-06-28 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after June 30 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2018-06-28 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 4967.). |
2018-06-28 | Senate | From committee: That the measure be returned to Senate Floor for consideration. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (June 28) |
2018-06-26 | Senate | From committee: Pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10 that the measure be re-referred to Com. on APPR. pursuant to Joint Rule 10.5. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 26). |
2018-06-25 | Senate | From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on JUD. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(b). (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2018-06-25 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(b). |
2018-06-25 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2018-06-25 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-06-21 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2018-06-21 | Senate | Ordered to second reading. |
2018-06-21 | Senate | From inactive file. |
2017-09-16 | Senate | Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator McGuire. |
2017-09-15 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-09-15 | Senate | Ordered to second reading. |
2017-09-15 | Senate | (Ayes 24. Noes 11. Page 2944.) |
2017-09-15 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. |
2017-09-12 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2017-09-12 | Senate | Senate Rule 29.3(b) suspended. (Ayes 25. Noes 13. Page 2730.) |
2017-08-21 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2017-07-19 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on RLS. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (July 18). Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2017-07-18 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 9. Noes 1.) (July 18). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2017-07-13 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on E., U. & C. |
2017-07-13 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. |
2017-07-06 | Senate | Re-referred to Coms. on B., P. & E.D., E., U. & C., and JUD. |
2017-06-20 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2017-06-20 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. |
2017-06-19 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. |
2017-05-11 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2017-05-11 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1483.) |
2017-05-04 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2017-05-03 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (May 2). |
2017-05-01 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on P. & C.P. |
2017-04-27 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on P. & C.P. Read second time and amended. |
2017-04-18 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2017-03-28 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2017-03-09 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2017-02-21 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on P. & C.P. and C. & C. |
2017-02-10 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 12. |
2017-02-09 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 20601 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 22550 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Business and Professions Code | 22949.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Civil Code | 1798.100 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Government Code | 6254.16 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Utilities Code | 2891 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Utilities Code | 8382 | New Code | See Bill Text |