CA AB375 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 1 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-09-09 - Read third time. Refused passage. (Ayes 20. Noes 16. Page 2474.).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 1 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-09-09 - Read third time. Refused passage. (Ayes 20. Noes 16. Page 2474.).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 3212.13 to the Labor Code, relating to workers' compensation.
Title
Workers' compensation: hospital employees: presumption.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-09-09 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB375 Skinner By Padilla (Y: 20 N: 16 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-09-07 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB375 Skinner Reconsider (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-08-25 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-08-15 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-22 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-01 - Assembly - AB 375 SKINNER Assembly Third Reading (Y: 49 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2011-05-27 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-13 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-09-07 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB375 Skinner Reconsider (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-08-25 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-08-15 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-22 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-01 - Assembly - AB 375 SKINNER Assembly Third Reading (Y: 49 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2011-05-27 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-13 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-09-09 | Read third time. Refused passage. (Ayes 20. Noes 16. Page 2474.). | |
2011-09-07 | Read third time. Refused passage. (Ayes 20. Noes 15. Page 2365.). Motion to reconsider made by Senator Padilla. Reconsideration granted. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 2365.) | |
2011-09-01 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2011-08-31 | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. | |
2011-08-29 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2011-08-25 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 3.) (August 25). | |
2011-08-18 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2011-08-15 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR. In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. | |
2011-07-05 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2011-06-29 | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2011-06-28 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (June 22). | |
2011-06-23 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |
2011-06-08 | Referred to Com. on L. & I.R. | |
2011-06-01 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |
2011-06-01 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 49. Noes 25. Page 1720.) | |
2011-05-31 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2011-05-27 | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 27). Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. | |
2011-05-04 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | |
2011-04-13 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 4.) (April 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2011-02-24 | Referred to Com. on INS. | |
2011-02-15 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 17. | |
2011-02-14 | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Labor Code | 3212.13 | New Code | See Bill Text |