CA AB374 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on October 8 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-02-01 - Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 26200 of the Business and Professions Code, relating to cannabis.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Cannabis: retail preparation, sale, and consumption of noncannabis food and beverage products.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-09-11 - Assembly - AB 374 Haney Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 66 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-09-07 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB374 Haney By Caballero (Y: 34 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-06-26 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-31 - Assembly - AB 374 Haney Assembly Third Reading (Y: 64 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2023-04-26 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 17 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-11 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Governmental Organization] (Y: 15 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-02-01AssemblyConsideration of Governor's veto stricken from file.
2024-01-03AssemblyConsideration of Governor's veto pending.
2023-10-08AssemblyVetoed by Governor.
2023-09-15 Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
2023-09-11AssemblySenate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 66. Noes 9. Page 3200.).
2023-09-07AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 9 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
2023-09-07SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 34. Noes 3. Page 2453.).
2023-08-23SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2023-08-22SenateRead third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2023-06-27SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2023-06-26SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 1.) (June 26).
2023-06-14SenateReferred to Com. on B., P. & E. D.
2023-06-01SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2023-05-31AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 64. Noes 9. Page 1956.)
2023-05-18AssemblyRead third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 1580.)
2023-05-09AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2023-05-08AssemblyOrdered to second reading.
2023-05-08AssemblyWithdrawn from committee.
2023-05-02AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on APPR.
2023-05-01AssemblyRead second time and amended.
2023-04-27AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 17. Noes 4.) (April 26).
2023-04-17AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on G.O.
2023-04-12AssemblyRead second time and amended.
2023-04-11AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on G.O. (Ayes 15. Noes 2.) (April 11).
2023-02-17AssemblyReferred to Coms. on B. & P. and G.O.
2023-02-02AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 4.
2023-02-01AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Business and Professions Code26200Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback