CA AB372 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 7 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-07 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 290, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 7 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-07 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 290, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add and repeal Section 1203.099 of the Penal Code, relating to domestic violence.
Title
Domestic violence: probation.
Sponsors
Asm. Mark Stone [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-08-27 - Assembly - AB 372 STONE Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-21 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB372 Mark Stone By Dodd (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-15 - Assembly - AB 372 STONE Assembly Third Reading (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-18 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-21 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB372 Mark Stone By Dodd (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-15 - Assembly - AB 372 STONE Assembly Third Reading (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-18 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-07 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 290, Statutes of 2018. | |
2018-09-07 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2018-09-04 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. |
2018-08-27 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 6609.). |
2018-08-22 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 24 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2018-08-21 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5511.). |
2018-08-07 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-08-06 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2018-06-20 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-06-14 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2018-06-11 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2018-06-06 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2017-07-11 | Senate | In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2017-06-27 | Senate | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2017-06-19 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2017-05-15 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2017-05-15 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 1521.) |
2017-04-24 | Assembly | From Consent Calendar by request of Assembly Member Mark Stone. To Third Reading. |
2017-04-20 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2017-04-19 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 18). |
2017-04-04 | Assembly | In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2017-04-04 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2017-04-03 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended. |
2017-03-21 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2017-02-21 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2017-02-10 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 12. |
2017-02-09 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 1203.097 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 1203.099 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |