CA AB370 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 7 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-10-07 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 326, Statutes of 2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 7 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-10-07 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 326, Statutes of 2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 51461 of the Education Code, relating to pupil instruction.
Title
Pupil instruction: State Seal of Biliteracy.
Sponsors
Asm. Dawn Addis [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-09-11 - Assembly - AB 370 Addis Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-09-06 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB370 Addis By Limón (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-07 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-27 - Assembly - AB 370 Addis Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-19 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-03-29 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-09-06 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB370 Addis By Limón (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-07 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-27 - Assembly - AB 370 Addis Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-19 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-03-29 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-10-07 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 326, Statutes of 2023. | |
2023-10-07 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2023-09-15 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. | |
2023-09-11 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 3175.). |
2023-09-07 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 3011.) |
2023-09-06 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 8 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2023-09-06 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2429.). |
2023-08-21 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2023-08-17 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2023-06-27 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2023-06-26 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2023-06-08 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2023-06-07 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 7). |
2023-05-30 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2023-05-10 | Senate | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2023-04-27 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2023-04-27 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 1362.) |
2023-04-20 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2023-04-19 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (April 19). |
2023-04-03 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2023-03-30 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2023-03-30 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (March 29). |
2023-03-21 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2023-03-20 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended. |
2023-02-09 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2023-02-02 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 4. |
2023-02-01 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 51461 | Amended Code | Citation Text |