CA AB37 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 24 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-24 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 102, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 60605.13 of the Education Code, relating to pupil instruction.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Pupil instruction: visual and performing arts: content standards in media arts.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-07-03 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd AB37 (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-07 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-17 - Assembly - AB 37 O'DONNELL Assembly Third Reading (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-15 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-07-24 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 102, Statutes of 2017.
2017-07-24 Approved by the Governor.
2017-07-12AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 11:30 a.m.
2017-07-03AssemblyIn Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
2017-07-03SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 33. Noes 0. Page 1841.).
2017-06-27SenateRead second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
2017-06-26SenateFrom committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
2017-06-07SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 7). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-05-10SenateReferred to Com. on ED.
2017-04-17SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2017-04-17AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 1014.)
2017-04-06AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2017-04-05AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (April 5).
2017-03-16AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (March 15). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-03-16AssemblyCoauthors revised.
2017-03-07AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on ED.
2017-03-06AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended.
2017-01-19AssemblyReferred to Com. on ED.
2016-12-06AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee January 5.
2016-12-05AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Education Code60605.13Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback